OH SB75 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-16 - Effective 8/16/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-16 - Effective 8/16/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 303.21, 519.21, and 5713.30 and to enact section 901.80 of the Revised Code to limit the authority of a board of county commissioners or board of township trustees to prohibit agritourism through zoning, to apply current agricultural use valuation to land used for agritourism for property tax purposes, and to establish immunity in a civil action for agritourism providers.
Title
Addresses agritourism
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-16 | Effective 8/16/16 | |
2016-05-04 | House | Passed |
2016-05-03 | House | Reported: Agriculture and Rural Development |
2016-01-20 | House | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Rural Development |
2015-11-19 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Passed |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Civil Justice |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
3 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
3 | 03 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
5 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
5 | 19 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 13 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
9 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 01 | 80 | New Code | See Bill Text |