OH SCR9 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Introduced and Referred to Committee: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs
Pending: House Armed Services and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Introduced and Referred to Committee: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs
Pending: House Armed Services and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To urge the U.S. Congress to support the provision of prompt and comprehensive mental health treatment to military personnel and veterans who are suffering from post-traumatic stress disorder and other service-related stress disorders.
Title
Urge Congress support military, veteran mental health treatment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs |
2024-04-16 | House | Introduced |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported: Veterans and Public Safety |
2023-11-15 | Senate | Referred to committee: Veterans and Public Safety |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Offered |
Subjects
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
House Armed Services and Veterans Affairs Committee
Military and Veterans
Senate Veterans and Public Safety Committee
House Armed Services and Veterans Affairs Committee
Military and Veterans
Senate Veterans and Public Safety Committee