OK HB1002 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Approved by Governor 11/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Approved by Governor 11/22/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Redistricting; creating the Oklahoma Congressional Redistricting Act of 2021; repealer; emergency.
Title
Redistricting; creating the Oklahoma Congressional Redistricting Act of 2021; repealer; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Redistricting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 73 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House: State and Federal Redistricting Committee: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 73 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House: State and Federal Redistricting Committee: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-19 | House | Approved by Governor 11/22/2021 |
2021-11-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-11-19 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-11-19 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-11-19 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-11-19 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10 |
2021-11-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Redistricting committee; CR filed |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Select Committee on Redistricting |
2021-11-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-11-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-11-17 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-11-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 19 |
2021-11-17 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Paxton |
2021-11-17 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2021-11-17 | House | General Order |
2021-11-16 | House | CR; Do Pass State and Federal Redistricting Committee |
2021-11-16 | House | Second Reading referred to State and Federal Redistricting |
2021-11-15 | House | Authored by Representative McCall, Martinez |
2021-11-15 | House | First Reading |