OK HB1048 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; authorizing the subpoena of witnesses and production of records for certain investigations; effective date.
Title
State government; authorizing the subpoena of witnesses and production of records for certain investigations; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0 |
2015-02-09 | House | General Order |
2015-02-05 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-05 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Biggs |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Children
Civil and Criminal Procedure and Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Government
Telecommunications and Technology
Civil and Criminal Procedure and Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Government
Telecommunications and Technology