OK HB1051 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Counties and county officers; modifying person in charge of inventory material; effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; modifying person in charge of inventory material; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - House - House: (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Approved by Governor 05/09/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-03 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-03 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-02 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-02 | Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-02 | SA's read, adopted | |
2011-04-12 | SA's received | |
2011-04-12 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-11 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-11 | Title restored | |
2011-04-11 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2011-03-29 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-29 | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-14 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2011-03-01 | First Reading | |
2011-03-01 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-02-28 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-02-28 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2011-02-28 | General Order | |
2011-02-21 | Removed from Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-17 | Placed on Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-17 | Authored by Senator Ballenger (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-17 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Sanders | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 178 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 178 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |