OK HB1080 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-12 - Second Reading referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-12 - Second Reading referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Roads, bridges and ferries; designating the TSGT Jason Norton Memorial Bridge. Emergency.
Title
Roads, bridges and ferries; designating the TSGT Jason Norton Memorial Bridge. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-02-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-12 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-02-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-17 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 1 | |
2009-02-17 | General Order | |
2009-02-12 | Authored by Senator Wyrick (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-12 | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Glenn | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |