OK HB1124 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Child care facilities; sex offender employment; OMES to contract with statewide vendor that can provide electronic fingerprint services to support the national criminal history records.; effective date.
Title
Child care facilities; sex offender employment; OMES to contract with statewide vendor that can provide electronic fingerprint services to support the national criminal history records.; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Children, Youth, and Family Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Children, Youth, and Family Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Died in conference |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Anderson, Crain, Treat, Griffin, Standridge, Pittman, Floyd |
2016-04-25 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Children, Youth, and Family Services |
2015-05-18 | House | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Anderson, Standridge, Treat, Crain, David, Paddack, Pittman |
2015-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Children, Youth, and Family Services |
2015-04-16 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2015-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2015-03-11 | House | Amended |
2015-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-11 | House | General Order |
2015-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth, and Family Services Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth, and Family Services |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Russ |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |