OK HB1276 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Measure failed: Ayes: 16 Nays: 28
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Measure failed: Ayes: 16 Nays: 28
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Explosives; modifying scope of certain prohibited acts; effective date.
Title
Explosives; modifying scope of certain prohibited acts; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 16 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 16 Nays: 28 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2015-03-11 | House | Amended |
2015-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-11 | House | General Order |
2015-02-05 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Cockroft |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1320 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1767 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1767 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1767 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 121 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |