OK HB1283 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1283
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; modifying the Inspectors Act; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; modifying the Inspectors Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 29 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | House | Approved by Governor 05/31/2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 29 Nays: 15 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2017-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2017-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2017-05-20 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-18 | House | Title restored |
2017-05-18 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Newberry, Leewright, Stanislawski, Bice, Scott, Pittman, Bass |
2017-05-01 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 7 |
2017-03-21 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-21 | House | General Order |
2017-02-23 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1283 (Carry Over) 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2017