OK HB1285 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; Task Force for the Study of State Tax Credits and Economic Incentives; report; effective date; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Task Force for the Study of State Tax Credits and Economic Incentives; report; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Cannaday [D] | Rep. David Dank [R] | Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Rep. Dan Kirby [R] |
Sen. Michael Mazzei [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Seneca Scott [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House: R (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: : (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House: R (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: : (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/24/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-18 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-17 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-17 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2011-05-16 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2011-05-16 | To Senate | |
2011-05-16 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4 | |
2011-05-16 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Scott | |
2011-05-16 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2011-05-13 | Title restored | |
2011-05-13 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kirby | |
2011-05-13 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2011-05-04 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2011-04-25 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA | |
2011-04-07 | SA's received | |
2011-04-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-06 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2011-04-06 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-06 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-31 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-31 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 3; Ayes: 81 Nays: 9 | |
2011-03-15 | Amended | |
2011-03-15 | House Rule suspended | |
2011-03-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cannaday | |
2011-03-15 | General Order | |
2011-03-03 | Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-03 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2011-03-03 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Dank | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |