OK HB1303 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Tibbs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Tibbs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; modifying testing window dates for certain criterion-referenced tests. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; modifying testing window dates for certain criterion-referenced tests. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Tibbs | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2009-03-02 | First Reading | |
2009-03-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-02-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-26 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2009-02-26 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hickman | |
2009-02-26 | General Order | |
2009-02-19 | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-19 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ownbey | |
2009-02-19 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Kern | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |