OK HB1324 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public retirement systems; Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System; Internal Revenue Code requirements; limitations; effective date; reference of certain health insurance premiums; emergency.
Title
Public retirement systems; Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System; Internal Revenue Code requirements; limitations; effective date; reference of certain health insurance premiums; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-06 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Approved by Governor 05/13/2013 |
2013-05-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-07 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-06 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-06 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 1 |
2013-05-06 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2013-04-18 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Pensions committee; CR filed |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Pensions |
2013-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-02-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2013-02-12 | House | General Order |
2013-02-07 | House | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McDaniel (Randy) |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 50 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 50 | 114 | New Code | See Bill Text |