OK HB1361 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Homestead and exemptions; amending various provisions of the Family Wealth Preservation Trust Act; effective date.
Title
Homestead and exemptions; amending various provisions of the Family Wealth Preservation Trust Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Johnson [R] | Rep. Ron Peters [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: CONFEREES ARE UNABLE TO AGREE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: CONFEREES ARE UNABLE TO AGREE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Died in conference | |
2012-05-03 | Further conference granted, SCs named Johnson (Rob), Sykes, Mazzei, Brinkley, Laster, Burrage | |
2012-02-08 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2011-05-16 | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree | |
2011-05-05 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2011-05-02 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2011-04-27 | SA's received | |
2011-04-27 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 8 | |
2011-04-26 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-26 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-05 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-14 | First Reading | |
2011-03-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2 | |
2011-03-10 | General Order | |
2011-02-28 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-28 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Peters | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |