OK HB1383 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public retirement systems; Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System; benefit computations; emergency.
Title
Public retirement systems; Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System; benefit computations; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Approved by Governor 05/24/2013 |
2013-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2013-05-16 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2013-05-16 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-16 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 22; Ayes: 68 Nays: 23 |
2013-05-16 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-15 | House | Title restored |
2013-05-15 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-02 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2013-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-09 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Pensions committee; CR filed |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Pensions |
2013-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-02-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 19 |
2013-02-12 | House | General Order |
2013-02-07 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-07 | House | CR; Do Pass Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McDaniel (Randy) |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |