OK HB1414 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Fees; establishing certain court fee; creating Council on Judicial Complaints Revolving Fund; appropriating monies credited to the fund for Council purposes; effective date.
Title
Fees; establishing certain court fee; creating Council on Judicial Complaints Revolving Fund; appropriating monies credited to the fund for Council purposes; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor 04/26/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-19 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 19 | |
2011-04-19 | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version | |
2011-04-19 | Title restored | |
2011-04-19 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-07 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-30 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 36 | |
2011-03-17 | General Order | |
2011-03-03 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-03 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Joyner, Blackwell | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1663 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 152 | New Code | See Bill Text |