OK HB1426 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Game and fish; modifying wildlife check-in procedures and penalties; effective date.
Title
Game and fish; modifying wildlife check-in procedures and penalties; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Rep. Scott Biggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 65 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 13 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Agriculture and Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 65 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 13 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Agriculture and Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Approved by Governor 05/29/2013 |
2013-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 30 Nays: 9 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2013-05-16 | Senate | CCR read |
2013-05-16 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-16 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 20 |
2013-05-16 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-15 | House | Title restored |
2013-05-15 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-02 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Agriculture and Wildlife |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Justice, Coates, Schulz, Fields, Garrison, Sparks |
2013-04-30 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 11 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Backed up to General Order |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 27 Nays: 12 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Justice |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 23 Nays: 20 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Rule suspended |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife |
2013-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 23 |
2013-02-25 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 64 Nays: 18 |
2013-02-20 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Biggs |
2013-02-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 56 |
2013-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-20 | House | General Order |
2013-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Biggs |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Animals and Game and Fish
Civil and Criminal Procedure and Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Technology
Telecommunications and Technology
Civil and Criminal Procedure and Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Technology
Telecommunications and Technology