OK HB1469 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Commission on Interstate Cooperation; clarifying composition; repealing committee; effective date.
Title
Commission on Interstate Cooperation; clarifying composition; repealing committee; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-06 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Approved by Governor 05/13/2013 |
2013-05-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-07 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-06 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-06 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 3 |
2013-05-06 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2013-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-16 | Senate | coauthored by Murphey |
2013-04-16 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Murphey and substitute with Representative Turner |
2013-04-16 | Senate | remove as coauthor Representative(s) Turner |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2013-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 4 |
2013-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Turner, Walker |
2013-03-07 | House | General Order |
2013-03-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Murphey |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |