OK HB1527 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Redistricting; creating the Oklahoma Congressional Redistricting Act of 2011; repealer; effective date.
Title
Redistricting; creating the Oklahoma Congressional Redistricting Act of 2011; repealer; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House: Committee on Redistricting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House: Committee on Redistricting: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House: Committee on Redistricting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House: Committee on Redistricting: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-04 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-04 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-03 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-03 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-03 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 5 | |
2011-05-03 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-26 | Reported Do Pass Redistricting committee; CR filed | |
2011-04-20 | Second Reading referred to Redistricting | |
2011-04-19 | First Reading | |
2011-04-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-19 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-19 | General Order | |
2011-04-14 | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) | |
2011-04-14 | Coauthored by Representative(s) DeWitt | |
2011-04-14 | Remove Representative DeWitt as principal House author and substitute with Representative Steele | |
2011-04-14 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Redistricting Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Redistricting | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative DeWitt | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | 5 | 1 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
14 | 5 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
14 | 5 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
14 | 5 | 4 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
14 | 5 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
14 | 6 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
14 | 6 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
14 | 6 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
14 | 6 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
14 | 6 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |