OK HB1584 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Labor; Employment Security Act of 1980; providing penalty for failure to provide certain notice; effective date.
Title
Labor; Employment Security Act of 1980; providing penalty for failure to provide certain notice; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Scooter Park [R] | Sen. Darcy Jech [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | House | Approved by Governor 04/27/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-21 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-05 | House | General Order |
2015-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Park |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |