OK HB1591 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; encouraging all reading instruction in certain grades to include certain elements of instruction. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; encouraging all reading instruction in certain grades to include certain elements of instruction. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Coody [R] | Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] |
Sen. Jabar Shumate [D] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in conference | |
2010-03-09 | Conference granted, SCs named Jolley, Ford, Halligan, Branan, Easley | |
2010-03-04 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-05-12 | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree | |
2009-05-11 | HC's named: Coody, Miller, Jackson, Jones | |
2009-05-05 | Conference granted, SCs named Jolley, Ford, Halligan, Branan, Easley | |
2009-04-27 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-04-16 | SA's received | |
2009-04-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-15 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-15 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2009-04-15 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-03-31 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2009-03-30 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2009-03-05 | First Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-04 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 4 | |
2009-03-04 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2009-03-04 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern, Shumate, Tibbs | |
2009-03-04 | General Order | |
2009-02-26 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Coody | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |