OK HB1604 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; clarifying guidelines for seizing property; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; clarifying guidelines for seizing property; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Approved by Governor 04/29/2011 | |
2011-04-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-21 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-20 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-20 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-17 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-16 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1 | |
2011-03-16 | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-16 | General Order | |
2011-02-22 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sullivan | |
2011-02-22 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Stiles | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1738 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
21 | 2002 | New Code | See Bill Text |