OK HB1611 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1611
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Civil procedure; The Small Claims Procedure Act; authorizing certain entities to represent themselves in small claims actions; effective date.
Title
Civil procedure; The Small Claims Procedure Act; authorizing certain entities to represent themselves in small claims actions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 04/23/2024 |
2024-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 5 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2024-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-11 | House | General Order |
2024-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2024-02-07 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Remove Representative Martinez as principal House author and substitute with Representative Osburn |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Martinez |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1611 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Rules