OK HB1681 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Governmental Tort Claims Act; providing procedural requirements for certain actions; emergency.
Title
The Governmental Tort Claims Act; providing procedural requirements for certain actions; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 81 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by Governor 05/12/2015 |
2015-05-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-05-11 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-06 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 2 |
2015-05-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lockhart |
2015-05-06 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2015-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 4 |
2015-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-09 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Grau |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |