OK HB1701 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Vetoed 05/17/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Vetoed 05/17/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Sunset; Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Advisory Council; removing Council from Oklahoma Sunset Law; re-creating Council; effective date.
Title
Sunset; Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Advisory Council; removing Council from Oklahoma Sunset Law; re-creating Council; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-13 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Vetoed 05/17/2013 |
2013-05-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-14 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-13 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-13 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-13 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2013-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2013-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 4 |
2013-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-13 | House | General Order |
2013-03-11 | House | Published on Consent Docket |
2013-02-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Blackwell |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |