OK HB1743 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; creating the Nonconsensual Towing Act; empowering Corporation Commission; effective dates.
Title
Motor vehicles; creating the Nonconsensual Towing Act; empowering Corporation Commission; effective dates.
Sponsors
Sen. Don Barrington [R] | Sen. Rob Johnson [R] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Rep. Paul Roan [D] | Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-19 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-19 | coauthored by Nollan | |
2011-05-19 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-19 | CCR read | |
2011-05-18 | To Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-18 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze | |
2011-05-18 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-17 | Emergency removed | |
2011-05-17 | Title restored | |
2011-05-17 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-12 | Conference granted, SCs named Sykes, Newberry, Johnson (Rob), Simpson, Ivester, Ellis | |
2011-05-02 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2011-04-27 | SA's received | |
2011-04-27 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 13 | |
2011-04-26 | coauthored by Barrington | |
2011-04-26 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-05 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-05 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-14 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan | |
2011-03-14 | General Order | |
2011-02-28 | Removed from Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-24 | Placed on Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-24 | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-24 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Johnson | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 91 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 11 | 1110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 951 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 952 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 953 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 953 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 953A | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 954A | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 956 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 966 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 967 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 968 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |