OK HB1888 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Counties and county officers; expanding scope of the Rural Ambulance Service Districts Act; modifying name; specifying certain governing body in certain circumstance; require certain response. Emergency.
Title
Counties and county officers; expanding scope of the Rural Ambulance Service Districts Act; modifying name; specifying certain governing body in certain circumstance; require certain response. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-19 - House - House: (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-24 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-24 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-19 | 2 CCR read | |
2010-05-19 | To Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2 | |
2010-05-19 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman | |
2010-05-19 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-17 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-13 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-12 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-04-12 | CCR submitted | |
2010-02-23 | Conference granted, SCs named Sparks, Johnson (Mike), Stanislawski, Lamb, Bingman | |
2010-02-04 | HC's named: Richardson, Cox, Hickman, Faught, Morgan, Roan, Carey, Sherrer, Trebilcock | |
2010-02-02 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-05-22 | 3 CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree | |
2009-05-22 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2009-05-21 | 2 CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2009-05-20 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2009-05-20 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2009-05-19 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2009-05-19 | Emergency added | |
2009-05-19 | Enacting clause restored | |
2009-05-19 | Title restored | |
2009-05-19 | CCR submitted | |
2009-05-07 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2009-04-30 | HC's named: Richardson, Roan, Morgan, Cox, Faught, Trebilcock, Hickman, Carey | |
2009-04-27 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-04-21 | SA's received | |
2009-04-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-20 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-04-20 | Title stricken | |
2009-04-20 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2009-04-06 | coauthored by Pittman | |
2009-04-06 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-04-06 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-04-02 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-20 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-10 | First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-09 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 15 | |
2009-03-09 | Title stricken | |
2009-03-09 | Amended | |
2009-03-09 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2009-03-09 | Authored by Senator Sparks (principal Senate author) | |
2009-03-09 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan, Morgan, Cox, Auffet, Sherrer, Faught | |
2009-03-09 | General Order | |
2009-02-26 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Collins, Kiesel | |
2009-02-26 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Richardson | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 1201 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1202 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1203 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1204 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1205 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1206 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1207 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1208 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1209 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1210 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1211 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1212 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1213 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1214 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1215 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1216 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1217 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1218 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1219 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1220 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 1221 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 1 | 2504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1370 | New Code | See Bill Text |