OK HB1919 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/29/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; income tax deduction; foster children; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; income tax deduction; foster children; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Approved by Governor 05/29/2013 |
2013-05-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 32 Nays: 8 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Considered and deferred |
2013-05-22 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2013-05-22 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-22 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1 |
2013-05-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Mulready, Brown |
2013-05-22 | House | CCR adopted |
2013-05-21 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2013-05-21 | House | Title restored |
2013-05-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McCullough |
2013-05-21 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-06 | House | HC's named: GCCA |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2013-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-18 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-03 | Senate | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2013-03-13 | Senate | coauthored by Ownbey, Nollan |
2013-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Proctor, Hoskin, Inman |
2013-03-12 | House | General Order |
2013-02-27 | House | Title stricken |
2013-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Shannon |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |