OK HB1965 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-06 - coauthored by Ritze
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-06 - coauthored by Ritze
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; relates to the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner; providing for independent office; repealing the Board of Medicolegal Investigations. Effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; relates to the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner; providing for independent office; repealing the Board of Medicolegal Investigations. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Benge [R] | Sen. Glenn Coffee [R] | Rep. Lucky Lamons [D] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] |
Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-06 | coauthored by Ritze | |
2009-04-06 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-04-06 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-04-02 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-24 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Ritze | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-16 | First Reading | |
2009-03-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-12 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 5 | |
2009-03-12 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nelson | |
2009-03-12 | General Order | |
2009-02-26 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-26 | Authored by Senator Coffee (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-26 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lamons | |
2009-02-26 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Benge | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 24A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 931 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 932 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 933 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 934 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 935 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 936 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 937 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 937 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 941a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 947 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 948 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 948 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 949 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 950 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 951 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 954 | New Code | See Bill Text |