OK HB1969 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Labor; creating the Oklahoma Employment First Act; effective date.
Title
Labor; creating the Oklahoma Employment First Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Approved by Governor 04/17/2015 |
2015-04-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 3 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2015-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 14 |
2015-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Brown (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Sherrer |
2015-03-04 | House | General Order |
2015-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative O'Donnell |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |