OK HB1985 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; Oklahoma Personnel Act; providing preference for certain persons; effective date.
Title
State government; Oklahoma Personnel Act; providing preference for certain persons; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Approved by Governor 05/25/2012 | |
2012-05-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-24 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-24 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-23 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-23 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-23 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2012-05-21 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2012-05-21 | To Senate | |
2012-05-21 | Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-21 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze | |
2012-05-21 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-17 | Title restored | |
2012-05-17 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Scott | |
2012-05-17 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-02 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2012-04-30 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules | |
2012-04-24 | SA's received | |
2012-04-24 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-23 | coauthored by Pittman | |
2012-04-23 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-09 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-28 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-03-28 | coauthored by Shortey | |
2012-03-28 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading | |
2012-03-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan, Sherrer, Reynolds, Bennett, Walker | |
2012-03-15 | General Order | |
2012-03-05 | Authored by Senator Burrage (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-05 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Inman | |
2012-03-05 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Hoskin | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |