OK HB2004 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public retirement systems; Teachers' Retirement System of Oklahoma; death benefits; disclaimer; effective date; emergency.
Title
Public retirement systems; Teachers' Retirement System of Oklahoma; death benefits; disclaimer; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Approved by Governor 05/06/2011 | |
2011-05-02 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-02 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-27 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-27 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-27 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2011-03-22 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 2 | |
2011-03-17 | General Order | |
2011-02-24 | Authored by Senator Shortey (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-24 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Dorman | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |