OK HB2041 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Workers' compensation; creating Workers' Compensation Self-Insurance Guaranty Fund Board; effective date.
Title
Workers' compensation; creating Workers' Compensation Self-Insurance Guaranty Fund Board; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Insurance Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Sullivan | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |