OK HB2078 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2078
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; inspection of instructional material; requiring all material purchased or made available on school property to be subject to inspection; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; inspection of instructional material; requiring all material purchased or made available on school property to be subject to inspection; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2023-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 15 |
2023-03-22 | House | Amended |
2023-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-22 | House | General Order |
2023-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2078 (Carry Over) 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Education