OK HB2116 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; date by which full-day kindergarten required; emergency.
Title
Schools; date by which full-day kindergarten required; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Gus Blackwell [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Sen. Earl Garrison [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R] |
Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] | Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - House - House: R (Y: 48 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Laid over | |
2011-05-04 | Considered | |
2011-04-27 | SA's received | |
2011-04-27 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-26 | Title restored | |
2011-04-26 | coauthored by Blackwell | |
2011-04-26 | coauthored by Fields, Garrison | |
2011-04-26 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2011-04-14 | Remove as author Senator Marlatt; authored by Senator Stanislawski | |
2011-04-14 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-03-29 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-29 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-03-15 | First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-14 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2 | |
2011-03-14 | General Order | |
2011-02-24 | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-24 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Hickman | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 13 | 107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 18 | 108 | New Code | See Bill Text |