OK HB2176 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Vetoed 06/05/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Vetoed 06/05/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State officials; relating to crimes against state property and revenue; prohibiting certain person from soliciting licensees regarding legislation; providing exemption; relating to the Oklahoma Program Performance Budgeting and Accountability Act; providing penalty for certain agencies. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
State officials; relating to crimes against state property and revenue; prohibiting certain person from soliciting licensees regarding legislation; providing exemption; relating to the Oklahoma Program Performance Budgeting and Accountability Act; providing penalty for certain agencies. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-19 - House - House: (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2009-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Vetoed 06/05/2009 | |
2009-05-22 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2009-05-21 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-21 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 | |
2009-05-21 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2009-05-19 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2009-05-19 | To Senate | |
2009-05-19 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-19 | CCR adopted | |
2009-05-19 | Title restored | |
2009-05-19 | CCR submitted | |
2009-05-06 | HC's named: Nelson, Hickman, Miller, Liebmann, Lamons, Glenn, Watson, Carey | |
2009-05-05 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2009-04-28 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-04-20 | SA's received | |
2009-04-20 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-16 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-16 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-04-06 | Title stricken | |
2009-04-06 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-04-02 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-05 | First Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-04 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 4 | |
2009-03-04 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2009-03-04 | General Order | |
2009-02-24 | Authored by Senator Aldridge (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-24 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hickman | |
2009-02-24 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Nelson | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 360 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
62 | 45 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |