OK HB2180 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma School of Science and Mathematics; making an appropriation; setting budgetary limitations; effective date; emergency.
Title
Oklahoma School of Science and Mathematics; making an appropriation; setting budgetary limitations; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R] | Rep. Michael Jackson [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Scott Martin [R] |
Sen. David Myers [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: RECONSIDER (Y: 57 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: RECONSIDER (Y: 57 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - House: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/24/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-19 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-05-19 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 1 | |
2011-05-19 | JCR adopted | |
2011-05-18 | Direct to Calendar | |
2011-05-17 | First Reading | |
2011-05-17 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-05-17 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 22 | |
2011-05-17 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 57 Nays: 23 | |
2011-05-17 | Ayes: 52 Nays: 10 | |
2011-05-17 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2011-05-17 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Denney | |
2011-05-17 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 30 | |
2011-05-17 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Denney | |
2011-05-17 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 17 | |
2011-05-17 | JCR adopted | |
2011-05-17 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Jackson, Hickman | |
2011-05-17 | General Order | |
2011-05-16 | JCR; Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-05-13 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-05-12 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jolley | |
2011-05-12 | Authored by Senator Myers (principal Senate author) | |
2011-05-12 | Authored by Representative Sears, Martin (Scott) | |
2011-05-12 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
86 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |