OK HB2191 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2191
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; corporate governance disclosure; codification; effective date.
Title
Insurance; corporate governance disclosure; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by Governor 05/13/2019 |
2019-05-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-07 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-06 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-06 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-04 | House | General Order |
2019-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Sims |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2191 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2019