OK HB2204 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Labor; modifying various sections of the Employment Security Act of 1980. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Labor; modifying various sections of the Employment Security Act of 1980. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Rep. Randy McDaniel [R] | Rep. Skye McNiel [R] |
Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 83 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 13 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 46) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 13 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 46) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Approved by Governor 05/08/2012 | |
2012-05-03 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-02 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-02 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 7 | |
2012-05-02 | SA's read, adopted | |
2012-04-30 | SA's received | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-25 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5 | |
2012-04-25 | coauthored by Allen, Ivester | |
2012-04-25 | Emergency added | |
2012-04-25 | Title restored | |
2012-04-25 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2012-03-12 | First Reading | |
2012-03-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 1 | |
2012-03-08 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-08 | Amended | |
2012-03-08 | General Order | |
2012-02-16 | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-16 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McNiel, Russ | |
2012-02-16 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative McDaniel (Randy) | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 2 | 204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 207 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 406 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 503 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 507 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 613 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 3 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 3 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 3 | 115 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 3 | 309 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 3 | 509 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 3 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 4 | 319 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 4 | 508 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 108 | New Code | See Bill Text |