OK HB2234 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oil and gas; modifying definition of seeping natural gas; changing funds and expenditure authorizations; effective date; emergency.
Title
Oil and gas; modifying definition of seeping natural gas; changing funds and expenditure authorizations; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] | Rep. Dennis Casey [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by Governor 05/12/2015 |
2015-05-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-05-06 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2015-04-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-28 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2 |
2015-04-28 | House | JCR adopted |
2015-04-28 | House | General Order |
2015-04-15 | House | JCR; Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2015-04-01 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2015-03-30 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Treat |
2015-03-30 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-30 | House | Authored by Representative Sears, Casey |
2015-03-30 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 180 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 317 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |