OK HB2248 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; sales tax levy ballots; prohibiting certain interpretation; effective date.
Title
Public finance; sales tax levy ballots; prohibiting certain interpretation; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2016 |
2016-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-21 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 27 |
2016-03-01 | House | General Order |
2016-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Murphey |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 34 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 1354 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |