OK HB2281 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2281
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; modifying penalties and fines; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; modifying penalties and fines; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Fry, Shaw, Thompson, Jech, Floyd, Matthews |
2017-05-11 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 5 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 8 |
2017-03-21 | House | Title stricken |
2017-03-21 | House | Amended |
2017-03-21 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-21 | House | General Order |
2017-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative O'Donnell |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2281 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - CCR submitted
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1541 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1543 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1550 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1550 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 17 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 4 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 4 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 403 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 503 | New Code | See Bill Text |