OK HB2296 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Veto overrride failed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 50
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Veto overrride failed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 50
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Torts; prohibiting liability for certain owners who allow shelter in office during severe weather; effective date.
Title
Torts; prohibiting liability for certain owners who allow shelter in office during severe weather; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-16 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 43 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Veto overrride failed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 50 | |
2012-04-16 | Ayes: 43 Nays: 36 | |
2012-04-16 | Motion to override veto tabled | |
2012-04-16 | Vetoed 04/13/2012 | |
2012-04-09 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-09 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-05 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-04 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 1 | |
2012-04-04 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-29 | coauthored by Shortey | |
2012-03-29 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading | |
2012-03-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-15 | General Order | |
2012-02-21 | Authored by Senator Crain (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-21 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2012-02-21 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Proctor | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |