OK HB2325 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; increasing age limitation for commissioned officer positions. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; increasing age limitation for commissioned officer positions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Ballenger [D] | Rep. Ed Cannaday [D] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] | Rep. Jerry Shoemake [D] |
Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Approved by Governor 04/09/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-06 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-06 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-05 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-05 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-05 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-24 | coauthored by Cannaday | |
2010-03-24 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-16 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Cannaday | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 1 | |
2010-03-08 | Authored by Senator Ballenger (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-08 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan, Tibbs | |
2010-03-08 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Shoemake | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |