OK HB2339 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2339
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; ad valorem taxation; exempt property; parsonages; fair cash value; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; ad valorem taxation; exempt property; parsonages; fair cash value; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Archer [R] | Sen. Chuck Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 57 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | House | Approved by Governor 05/19/2023 |
2023-05-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-05-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-05-11 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-05-11 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 26 |
2023-05-11 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2023-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 7 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Placed on General Order |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 26 |
2023-03-20 | House | Title stricken |
2023-03-20 | House | Amended |
2023-03-20 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-20 | House | General Order |
2023-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Remove Representative Boatman as principal House author and substitute with Representative Archer |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Boatman |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2339 (Carry Over) 2023-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2023