OK HB2348 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Military; modifying various sections; effective date.
Title
Military; modifying various sections; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] | Rep. Tom Newell [R] |
Sen. Corey Brooks [R] | Sen. John Montgomery [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-02 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | House | Approved by Governor 05/09/2016 |
2016-05-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-03 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-02 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-02 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2016-05-02 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2016-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2016-04-11 | Senate | coauthored by Brooks |
2016-04-07 | Senate | coauthored by Newell |
2016-04-07 | Senate | coauthored by Montgomery |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2016-02-10 | House | Amended |
2016-02-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Faught |
2016-02-10 | House | General Order |
2016-02-04 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1289 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1289 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
44 | 233 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 62 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |