OK HB2436 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Counties and county officers; creating the County Emergency Registration Act; requiring registration of roofing contractors during emergency; effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; creating the County Emergency Registration Act; requiring registration of roofing contractors during emergency; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Business, Labor and Retirement Laws Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Business, Labor and Retirement Laws Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Died in conference |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Justice, Newberry, Griffin, Dahm, Fields, Bass, Wyrick |
2016-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws |
2016-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 13 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2016-03-22 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 18 |
2016-02-17 | House | General Order |
2016-02-10 | House | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McBride |
2016-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Business, Labor and Retirement Laws Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Labor and Retirement Laws |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Biggs |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 339 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 339 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 339 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 339 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 339 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 339 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |