OK HB2446 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Approved by Governor 05/17/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Waters and water rights; declaring the protection of the waters of the state to be a compelling state interest; effective date.
Title
Waters and water rights; declaring the protection of the waters of the state to be a compelling state interest; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] | Rep. Mike Brown [D] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] |
Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Rep. Steve Vaughan [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | House | Approved by Governor 05/17/2016 |
2016-05-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-12 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-12 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 1 |
2016-05-12 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2016-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 9 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | coauthored by Fields |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore |
2016-03-10 | House | Motion expired |
2016-03-10 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative ODonnell |
2016-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 36 |
2016-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2016-03-10 | House | Amended |
2016-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Vaughan, Brown, McBride |
2016-03-10 | House | General Order |
2016-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative O'Donnell |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |