OK HB2505 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Labor; modifying various provisions of the Employment Security Act of 1980; effective date.
Title
Labor; modifying various provisions of the Employment Security Act of 1980; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | House | Approved by Governor 05/06/2014 |
2014-04-30 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-30 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-29 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-29 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 2 |
2014-04-29 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Allen, Schulz |
2014-04-29 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2014-04-23 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2014-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-03 | House | General Order |
2014-02-13 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McDaniel (Randy) |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 2 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 203 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 406 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 503 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 506 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 609 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 900 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 901 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 902 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 903 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 904 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 905 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 906 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 907 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 908 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 909 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 910 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 3 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 4 | 508 | New Code | See Bill Text |