OK HB2568 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; modifying penalty; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; modifying penalty; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Approved by Governor 04/27/2012 | |
2012-04-23 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-23 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-23 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-19 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 4 | |
2012-04-19 | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version | |
2012-04-19 | Title restored | |
2012-04-19 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-19 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-04-09 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-04-02 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-04-02 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-02-22 | First Reading | |
2012-02-22 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-21 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 1 | |
2012-02-21 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze | |
2012-02-21 | General Order | |
2012-02-14 | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-14 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Wright | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |