OK HB2625 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; modifying manner in which retired peace officers may carry firearms; effective date.
Title
Firearms; modifying manner in which retired peace officers may carry firearms; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 04/24/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze |
2018-03-08 | House | General Order |
2018-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative West (Kevin) |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |